SOUTH BRISTOL TOY LIBRARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lending library of play equipment and toys for public benefit. Public sessions promoting play for children and their carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2018
Total income includes £3,500 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.15k | £10.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.42k | £15.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £3.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 19 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 19 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 05 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | 18 December 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN LIVING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO SOUTH BRISTOL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF PLAY SESSIONS AND A NOT FOR PROFIT LENDING LIBRARY OF EDUCATIONAL AND AGE APPROPRIATE TOYS AND EQUIPMENT FOR BABIES AND CHILDREN TO PROMOTE THEIR PHYSICAL, COGNITIVE, SENSORY AND EMOTIONAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT THROUGH PLAY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window