IRLAM AND CADISHEAD FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of financial hardship amongst people in the Irlam and Cadishead, Salford and the surrounding area in such ways as the trustees from time-to-time think fit, in particular, but not exclusively by providing emergency food, essential toiletries, and household items to individuals and families in need and/or for distribution by charities or other organisation working to relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Salford City
Governance
- 13 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Reid | Chair | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lord | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Veronica Fowler | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Siddall | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Father John Anthony Clarke | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.23k | £14.87k | £15.63k | £26.35k | £11.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.34k | £3.62k | £11.90k | £14.45k | £25.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £7.50k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN THE IRLAM AND CADISHEAD, SALFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY (B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Joseph The Worker RC Church
Cutnook Lane
Irlam
M44 6GX
- Phone:
- 07763 645 964
- Website:
-
irlamcadishead.foodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window