THE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH HOPKINSON FOR THE POOR
Charity number: 508756
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gainsborough. wellbeing of young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,930
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Lincolnshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 23 May 1979: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £111 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 17 January 2020 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 01 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 13 July 2017 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 11TH FEBRUARY 1736 AND SCHEME OF THE 11 JULY 1978.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF CLOTHING FOR POOR WOMEN AND SCHOOLING FOR POOR CHILDREN. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GAINSBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window