RUNCORN AND DISTRICT FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runcorn and District Foodbank activities are the prevention or relief of poverty - by providing emergency food boxes containing a supply of balanced and nutritional foodstuffs to individuals in need and provides signposting to relevant information and other advisory services. Non-perishable food is donated by the community and is distributed to individuals via seven distribution centres.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
126 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
Governance
- 11 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne McPoland | Chair | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hennessey | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hancock | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
REV Gillian Younger | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL VEREY | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN BEANEY | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.69k | £110.42k | £93.31k | £117.33k | £115.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.69k | £39.00k | £92.15k | £105.27k | £66.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | £23.00k | £20.00k | £35.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THAT PART OF THE BOROUGH OF HALTON IN THE COUNTY OF CHESHIRE, WHICH IS SOUTH OF THE RIVER MERSEY, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF NORTH CHESHIRE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD BOXES CONTAINING A SUPPLY OF BALANCED AND NUTRITIONAL FOODSTUFFS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; (B) THE PROVISION OF OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES; (C) SUPPORTING PROJECTS AND INITIATIVES THAT PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
53a Russell Road
Runcorn
WA7 4BH
- Phone:
- 07922072906
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window