ANIMAL RESCUE MOROCCO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We strive to support the relief of suffering of animals in Morocco through the provisions of funds, and volunteer workers, to rescue homes and organisations that: 1) promote and support kindness and prevent or suppress cruelty to animals 2) ensure there is provision of vetinary care and treatment 3) seek to rehome, on a temporary or permanent basis either in Morocco or other countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Morocco
Governance
- 10 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN ADAMS | Chair | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH COLWELL DEGREE | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAR HARI KAUR | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.58k | £240.18k | £271.36k | £293.07k | £276.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.44k | £240.14k | £269.80k | £288.60k | £281.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR DOGS AND CATS, IN MOROCCO, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 BIRDWOOD ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3TB
- Phone:
- 01223479112
- Website:
-
Www.animalrescuemorocco.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window