THE PEVENSEY TOWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a Local History museum which is open to the public btween April and September.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 20 February 2017: CIO registration
- 20 March 2019: Funds received from 234782 THE PEVENSEY TOWN TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID DOCKERY | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Connolly | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Ruddy | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Molog | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Mandy dochery | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR ROBERT SLATER | Trustee | 12 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER EVANS | Trustee | 10 March 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.71k | £18.20k | £31.49k | £35.35k | £35.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.27k | £45.44k | £29.41k | £36.44k | £26.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 20 FEB 2017 AMENDED ON 10 MAY 2017 as amended on 11 May 2018 as amended on 28 Mar 2019 as amended on 18 Nov 2019 as amended on 09 Jun 2020 as amended on 09 Jul 2021 as amended on 03 May 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE GRADE II LISTED PEVENSEY COURT HOUSE AND GAOL, MARKET SQUARE AND CATTLE MARKET BEING OF HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL MERIT; 2. TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE COURT HOUSE AND GAOL AND ITS PLACE IN LOCAL AND NATIONAL HISTORY; 3. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PEVENSEY AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Pevensey Bridge Cottages
Wallsend Road
PEVENSEY
East Sussex
BN24 5JS
- Phone:
- 01323767615
- Email:
- parsonsgillian84@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window