Financial history BARTON STACEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1169530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.79k £20.49k £11.11k £4.53k £3.96k
Total expenditure £4.45k £3.64k £4.07k £7.12k £4.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £8.00k N/A N/A