BARTON STACEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1169530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide and maintain a building used as a village hall for the benefit of the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,955
Total expenditure: £4,917

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 October 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH COX Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record
Denize Goodall Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record
PEGGY CARTER Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record
BARRIE PURDUE Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record
PAUL GIBSON Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record
SAMANTHA DRINKWATER Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.79k £20.49k £11.11k £4.53k £3.96k
Total expenditure £4.45k £3.64k £4.07k £7.12k £4.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £8.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2021 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Barton Stacey Village Hall
BARTON STACEY
WINCHESTER
SO21 3rl
Phone:
01962760411
Email:
No information available