Financial history THE MALVERN MUSEUM SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 508766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.29k £21.59k £11.22k £8.72k £17.72k
Total expenditure £10.72k £7.21k £11.95k £15.84k £18.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.47k N/A N/A