Trustees THE MALVERN MUSEUM SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 508766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FAITH ANNE RENGER Chair
None on record
David Charles Boorn Trustee 12 June 2024
None on record
Jennifer Davies Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
Paul Michael Backhouse Trustee 04 April 2023
None on record
MR BRIAN ILLES Trustee 24 July 2017
None on record
James Melrose Vance Gilmer Trustee 17 February 2014
None on record
ROGER FRANCIS HALL-JONES Trustee
None on record
ROBERT LAWRENCE Trustee
None on record