Accounts and annual returns THE CAPACITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1171338
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 08 July 2024 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 July 2023 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 June 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 06 June 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window