MOCCAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 508769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of excellent facilities to serve the local community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,947
Total expenditure: £6,397

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN FORSYTH Chair 17 May 2011
None on record
Anna King Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Philip Venvil Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Paula Marie Shuman Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Cheryl King Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Adrian Austin Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
James John Hicks Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Paul Staff Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
JENNIFER FORSYTH Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
MARTIN WINROW Trustee 12 March 2018
None on record
Julia Whittall Trustee 09 June 2015
None on record
OWEN WHITTALL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.01k £22.21k £10.75k £5.66k £3.95k
Total expenditure £7.51k £5.74k £10.27k £9.78k £6.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.23k £8.15k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 April 2024 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Deer Park Close
Moccas
HEREFORD
HR2 9JA
Phone:
01981 501 113
Email:
MWGMH@GMX.COM
Website:

No information available