LS14 TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seacroft Pantry and Cafe Children and youth work including sports, clubs, groups and school holiday provision/activities Playbox activities, Community Events/Galas Arts & Crafts Groups, Mental Health and wellbeing support Art Therapy Signposting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £161,355 from 17 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 17 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY IAN JONES | Chair | 20 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ainscough | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Drinkwater | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN ROBINSON | Trustee | 22 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.50k | £510.82k | £572.27k | £688.49k | £499.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.42k | £337.45k | £555.54k | £601.67k | £641.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.80k | £159.99k | £130.20k | £162.85k | £161.35k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £8.45k | £1.06k | £17.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £502.37k | £571.21k | £670.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £337.45k | £555.54k | £601.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £32.94k | £43.84k | £83.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £38.70k | £28.16k | £17.42k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS (ÆOBJECTSÆ) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF LS14 (SEACROFT, SWARCLIFFE AND WHINMOOR) IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LS14 (SEACROFT, SWARCLIFFE AND WHINMOOR) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. [NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Contact information
- Address:
-
45-47 Ramshead Hill
Seacroft
LEEDS
LS14 1BT
- Phone:
- 01133180522
- Email:
- info@ls14trust.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window