Accounts and annual returns Tidal Family Support

Charity number: 1171718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 03 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 03 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 27 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 27 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 12 January 2020 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 12 January 2020 43 days late Download Open in new window