Financial history Tidal Family Support

Charity Number: 1171718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £61.55k £118.28k £134.13k £157.10k £165.34k
Total expenditure £64.75k £106.08k £104.21k £151.20k £158.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.25k £5.75k £8.55k