Tidal Family Support

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tidal Family Support is a community based, not for profit, child-focused charity that works with families who are directly impacted by separation or divorce. We are the only centre Enhanced accredited by the NACCC on the Isle of Wight. We provide a comprehensive range of child contact services, a wrap around family support service, counselling and signposting to other agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £5,750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 February 2017: CIO registration
- ISLE OF WIGHT SEPARATED FAMILIES (Working name)
- JIGSAW FAMILY SUPPORT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Ryan | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Lilley | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Smallwood | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Armitage | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.19k | £61.55k | £118.28k | £134.13k | £157.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.51k | £64.75k | £106.08k | £104.21k | £151.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.25k | £5.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2021
(These accounts |
25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 12 January 2020 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 12 January 2020 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2017 as amended on 14 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN OF SEPARATED FAMILIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) PROVIDING A SAFE, SECURE AND NEUTRAL LOCATION WHERE SUCH CHILDREN CAN SPEND TIME WITH THE PARENT THEY NO LONGER LIVE WITH, OR OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS THEY WOULD NOT OTHERWISE SEE; B) PROVIDING THE HIGHEST QUALITY, CHILD FOCUSED SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN OF SEPARATED FAMILIES; C) FACILITATING THE CONTACT ARRANGEMENTS IN WAYS WHICH ARE IN THE BEST INTERESTS OF THE CHILDREN; AND D) PROVIDING FAMILY OR ONE TO ONE COUNSELLING, MEDIATION, PARENTING COURSES AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES DESIGNED TO MANAGE THE DIFFICULT TRANSITIONS THAT ACCOMPANY SEPARATION AND DIVORCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roman House
Rink Road
Ryde
ISLE OF WIGHT
PO33 1LP
- Phone:
- 01983639793
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window