Financial history HATHERLEIGH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1169580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £113.98k £89.10k £100.78k £126.15k £127.42k
Total expenditure £117.06k £85.55k £89.46k £118.98k £126.89k
Income from government contracts £92.48k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £76.20k £79.32k £100.61k £113.64k