HATHERLEIGH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hatherleigh Pre-School provides Ofsted registered childcare Early years Education and child care for children under statutory school age. Based in Hatherleigh Community Centre in purpose built facilities providing services Monday - Friday term time only with core hours of 9am - 3pm with some extended days offering breakfast club 8.30am-9am and sessions 3 days per week during the summer holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £113,638 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 10 October 2016: CIO registration
- 20 October 2020: Funds received from 1027041 HATHERLEIGH PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Luxton | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Phillips | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Houldcroft | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Galvin | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sluggett | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.98k | £89.10k | £100.78k | £126.15k | £127.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.06k | £85.55k | £89.46k | £118.98k | £126.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £92.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £76.20k | £79.32k | £100.61k | £113.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; 2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; 3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; AND 4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hatherleigh Community Centre
Bowling Green Lane
Hatherleigh
Okehampton
EX20 3HB
- Phone:
- 01837811264
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window