Accounts and annual returns FIRST STEPS 2 SCHOOL - PERU

Charity number: 1170243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 August 2023 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 April 2022 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required