ROYTON AFTER-SCHOOL CARE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education and play facilities for school age children of working parents with priority given to single parent families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Total income includes £4,914 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oldham
Governance
- 06 June 1979: Standard registration
- 07 October 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 March 2013: Re-registered
- 18 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- R A S C A - R A S C A T (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.27k | £109.03k | £105.95k | £106.49k | £91.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.11k | £120.38k | £108.81k | £106.64k | £95.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.43k | £4.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 10 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 October 2020 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 04 October 2020 | 126 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 1 MAY 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND PLAY FACILITIES FOR SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN OF WORKING PARENTS WITH PRIORITY BEING GIVEN TO SINGLE PARENT FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
ROYTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window