FRIENDS OF WORCESTERSHIRE ARCHIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support Worcestershire Record Office by providing a pool of volunteers. Assist with funds for the purchase or repair of archives and equipment. Lobby appropriate bodies in the interests of Worcestershire Record Office as necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 June 1979: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE HEREFORD AND WORCESTER COUNTY RECORD OFFICE, WORCESTER BRANCH (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WORCESTER COUNTY RECORD OFFICE (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WORCESTERSHIRE COUNTY RECORD OFFICE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anna Muggeridge | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dilwyn Porter | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Claire Haslam | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBIN WHITTAKER | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Adrian Gregson | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
PAT HUGHES | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Peter Walker | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.31k | £3.10k | £2.67k | £3.94k | £4.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | £3.16k | £18.69k | £25.99k | £636 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 25/04/1979 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE WORCESTERSHIRE ARCHIVES THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE 1 APRIL 1974
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTON HOUSE
BROADGREEN
BROADWAS
WORCESTER
WR6 5NW
- Phone:
- 01886822137
- Email:
- peter43walker@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window