HIGHGATE INTERNATIONAL CHAMBER MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are fulfilled primarily by the organisation of an annual chamber music festival with concerts open to the public and associated activities including a free outreach project delivered to local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 October 2016: CIO registration
- HICMF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHOK ANTHONY KLOUDA | Chair | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marlena Hellebo | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen David Michael Potts | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|||||
IRINA OLIMPIA BOTAN | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE MARY KLOUDA | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CAMERON LLOYD MA MBA | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lady KATHARINE SUSAN GAVRON | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.76k | £5.88k | £41.37k | £50.49k | £46.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.97k | £1.99k | £32.81k | £53.41k | £52.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR OF THE ART OF MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Wey Lane
CHESHAM
HP5 1JH
- Phone:
- 07775581108
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window