BARNET MUSEUM & LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A local history Museum and local history society: inspiring interest, understanding and appreciation of the history and heritage of Barnet; recording and explaining the impact of Barnet on, and to, its community and beyond; celebrating the historic contributions made by Barnet people and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 September 2016: CIO registration
- 24 September 2017: Funds received from 295950 BARNET MUSEUM & LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN THRIDGOULD HALL | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen Downes | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT MICHAEL HARRISON | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
GUY WHEATCROFT | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS BIRD | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE ATKINS | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Noronha | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JORDAN | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.55k | £16.10k | £22.58k | £22.17k | £22.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.13k | £19.56k | £23.72k | £18.03k | £24.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.45k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE STUDY OF HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY OF CHIPPING BARNET, EAST BARNET, NEW BARNET (“BARNET”) AND THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARNET MUSEUM
31 WOOD STREET
BARNET
EN5 4BE
- Phone:
- 02084408066
- Email:
- enquiries@barnetmuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window