The Harmony Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilitated peer-support and advice to people in Bridport, Dorset living with mental health problems
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 08 November 2016: CIO registration
- HARMONY MENTAL WELLBEING (Working name)
- CRISIS AND CARE (Previous name)
- THE BURROUGH HARMONY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Charles Rawlings | Trustee | 18 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne West | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Louise Bark | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ragnhild Banton | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Coney | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wright | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Cliffe | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.24k | £157.14k | £135.33k | £192.70k | £218.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.68k | £150.45k | £150.67k | £165.22k | £234.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £80.44k | N/A | £83.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.45k | N/A | £3.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 08 NOV 2016 AMENDED ON 30 AUG 2017 as amended on 10 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM, OR RECOVERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ACTIVITIES HELPING THEM FURTHER THEIR RECOVERY AND INTEGRATE INTO THE COMMUNITY. THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO SUCH PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1 and 2
Edwards Tower Building
St. Michaels Trading Estate
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 3RR
- Phone:
- 01308 801154
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window