WHITTINGTON SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social, sport and recreational activities for the over 50's from the village and surrounding area. We also provide a building for use by a new Youth Group and for other charities and locals to use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,948 from 9 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 06 June 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Ann Gray | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Tomkins | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Hargrave | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE DYKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
GILLIAN ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.37k | £13.38k | £8.76k | £12.66k | £16.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.57k | £8.92k | £8.70k | £11.49k | £14.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | £10.50k | N/A | £483 | £1.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1979 AS AMENDED ON THE 14TH APRIL 1999 AND 6 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 The Meadows
Gobowen
OSWESTRY
Shropshire
SY11 3JD
- Phone:
- 01691679424
- Email:
- whittscc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window