IMPILOREVIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Impilorevival is involved in fund raising activities such as dinner parties, sponsored walks and monthly subscriptions from members and friends of the charity. Activities take place in UK for the benefit of hospitals in Zimbabwe. The charity source equipment and hospital consumables to help save lives and improve healthcare in Zimbabwe where healthcare provision is inadequate and under resourced.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 27 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH SIBANDA OLONGA | Chair | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.46k | £8.82k | £4.79k | £1.38k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47k | £5.66k | £5.02k | £1.77k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 209 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN ZIMBABWE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND SUPPLIES TO ZIMBABWEAN HOSPITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 FINCH DRIVE
FELTHAM
TW14 0DL
- Phone:
- 07957404963
- Email:
- JUDYOLONGA@IMPILOREVIVAL.ORG
- Website:
-
Impilorevival.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window