MASBOROUGH AND THORNHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Masborough and Thornhill by managing the community centre and providing facilities for recreation and leisure time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
Total income includes £18,069 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rotherham
Governance
- 04 June 1979: Standard registration
- 30 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 30 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1193167 SAFE HAVEN ROTHERHAM
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.64k | £10.06k | £8.45k | £9.73k | £20.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.99k | £13.57k | £9.92k | £8.85k | £18.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 17 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 16 NOVEMBER 1983 AND 6 JULY 1999.
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS MASBOROUGH AND THORNHILL INCLUDING FERHAM, HENLEY AND HOLMES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
MASBOROUGH AND THORNHILL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window