Financial history Eye to Eye Counselling Service

Charity number: 1170631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £503.56k £648.03k £517.87k £599.97k £626.71k
Total expenditure £450.20k £534.75k £621.83k £568.86k £598.07k
Income from government contracts £400.00k £400.00k £400.00k £400.00k £353.97k
Income from government grants N/A £79.73k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.56k £4.45k £1.89k £1.60k £4.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £497.15k £641.52k £513.13k £597.32k £614.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.84k £2.06k £2.84k £1.05k £8.15k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £450.20k £534.75k £621.83k £568.86k £598.07k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.33k £4.28k £4.28k £4.78k £4.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0