PHOEBE'S FAMILY G.B.
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Phoebe's Family G.B. is a fund raising & advice giving charity for projects in Kenya and other African countries. Our focus is the relief of poverty for women, children,disabled and the elderly. The education of young people & the vocational training of young people who have not been able to complete their education & are less likely to find employment. We encourage, equality & sustainability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 May 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 18 May 2017: Standard registration
- 09 April 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/05/2020 | 17/05/2021 | 17/05/2022 | 17/05/2023 | 17/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.67k | £43.21k | £29.00k | £19.95k | £7.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.42k | £53.02k | £34.39k | £23.26k | £8.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 May 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 May 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 May 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 17 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 17 May 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 May 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN KISUMU, BONDO AND SIAYA COUNTIES, KENYA BY ISSUING GRANTS WHICH WILL; PROVIDE OR SUPPORT ORPHANAGES, HOMES OR SCHOOLS FOR FAMILIES AND CHILDREN; AND THE PROVISION OF LIFE SKILLS TRAINING AND RECREATION FOR SAID PEOPLE REFERRED TO ABOVE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window