Financial history WEST WICKHAM SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1169115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.99k £3.21k £5.51k £11.65k £9.52k
Total expenditure £5.41k £4.75k £4.75k £10.54k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A