The Nick Alexander Music Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Nick Alexander Memorial Trust gives grants for musical instruments and musical equipment to small charities and community groups across the UK, particularly those representing disadvantaged communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 November 2016: Standard registration
- THE NICK ALEXANDER MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Alexander | Chair | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEELAGH PATRICIA ALEXANDER | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARRY FRANCIS ALEXANDER | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/09/2019 | 02/09/2020 | 02/09/2021 | 02/09/2022 | 02/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.17k | £18.49k | £13.41k | £6.66k | £13.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.01k | £10.10k | £10.03k | £10.89k | £11.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 September 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 September 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 OCT 2016 as amended on 30 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND MUSICAL EQUIPMENT TO COMMUNITY GROUPS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAIRFIELD
CLACTON ROAD
WEELEY
CLACTON-ON-SEA
CO16 9DN
- Phone:
- 01255 830112
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window