THE DUKE OF BUCCLEUCH BARNWELL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of young people (under 25) who live or are educated in the Barnwell, Hemington and Luddington; To provide or assist in the provision of facilities, in particular the Princess Alice Centre, for education, recreation, and other leisure time occupations of individuals living in the above parishes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 13 December 2016: CIO registration
- 02 February 2017: Funds received from 309812 THE DUKE OF BUCCLEUCH BARNWELL TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catriona Forrest | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Stewart Forrest | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Elizabeth Mailey-Hulme | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Croft | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helma Veeger | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Mailey | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica McIntosh | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Croft | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA RUTTERFORD | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.47k | £8.36k | £10.92k | £4.33k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £11.28k | £6.15k | £3.30k | £5.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: A) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, IN PARTICULAR THE PRINCESS ALICE CENTRE, FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE LIVING IN, OR WHO WERE EDUCATED IN, THE AREA OF BENEFIT THROUGH MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS TO: I) INDIVIDUALS IN FINANCIAL NEED; OR II) TO CHARITIES HAVING OBJECTS FOR THAT PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Barnwell
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 5PX
- Phone:
- 01832 274006
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window