THE CASTLEGATE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust operates in the Castlegate area of the city of Sheffield. It works with interested partners including the Council to secure restoration and re-use of historic buildings, whether listed or otherwise, and furthers public education about the history and significance of the area by offering events like guided walks and talks to explain the importance of the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 07 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE JUNE BAYLISS | Chair | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEIL BERRY | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CITIZENS OF SHEFFIELD AND THE NATION, BUILDINGS OR OTHER STRUCTURES OF HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN THE CASTLEGATE AREA OF SHEFFIELD AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT TO FOSTER AND SECURE THEIR RESTORATION AND RE-USE PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE OLD TOWN HALL. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ABOUT THE HISTORY, DEVELOPMENT, SIGNIFICANCE AND FUTURE OF THE HERITAGE BUILDINGS AND SITES OF THE CASTLEGATE AREA. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, LEARNING AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY DEVELOPING THE SKILLS OF PERSONS INVOLVED IN RESTORATION AND PARTICULARLY THOSE INVOLVED IN HISTORIC BUILDING RESTORATION PROJECTS IN CASTLEGATE. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN CASTLEGATE AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 MUSKOKA AVENUE
SHEFFIELD
S11 7RL
- Phone:
- 01142307693
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window