HARROW SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Church Charity aims to promote and advance the Religion and Religious Philosophy of SNU Spiritualism on the basis of the SNU Seven Principles. Church Services and Spiritual Healing and a Development Group are held throughout the week where the public are welcome We offer Spiritual Teaching and Workshops. All events are open to everyone who wishes to know more about Spiritualism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Mary Westlake | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Linda Handley | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHALA SUZANNE JERMY | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ASTRA TERTULLIEN | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH THOMAS BLAKE | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.69k | £12.14k | £14.15k | £2.52k | £5.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.36k | £10.79k | £10.95k | £5.56k | £2.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrow Spiritualist Church
1 Vaughan Road
HARROW
Middlesex
HA1 4DP
- Phone:
- 02085370092
- Email:
- lightonthehill@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window