POETIC UNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Poetic Unity is a Black-led charity that empowers children and young people to thrive through poetry-based education, employment, social justice and mental health support across the UK. Based in Brixton, Poetic Unity offers a service by the community, for the community, predominantly supporting young people of Black and mixed-Black heritage, aged 10-30 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashleigh Kieran Ferdinand | Chair | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Binta Fatou Marie Yade | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Herman Lewis | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sean Stacey Lindsay | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adekola Adebiyi | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
SASHA SHANTEL BENNETT | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
LUCRECIA SELINE AUGUSTIN | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI LOUISE MATTHEWS-ROBINSON | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.92k | £62.91k | £155.18k | £156.56k | £214.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.75k | £30.40k | £131.99k | £159.01k | £182.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £325 | N/A | £690 | £500 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE SUBJECT OF POETRY AND SPOKEN WORD; 2. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN LONDON BY ORGANISING WORKSHOP PROGRAMMES AND EVENTS AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Windrush Square
Brixton
London
SW2 1EF
- Phone:
- 07581266706
- Email:
- info@poeticunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window