Financial history CROYDON SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1169102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.20k £13.32k £13.29k £12.74k £18.08k
Total expenditure £16.91k £10.26k £11.14k £12.96k £13.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A