HOUSE OF WORSHIP CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet every Sunday in Hammersmith for our morning Praise and Worship Service. We do evangelism on streets sometimes by giving out flyers or just by simply having a fellowship at the park singing worship songs. We have our annual family camp too outside England sometimes. We share the gospel of Jesus Christ to anyone we meet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Philippines
Governance
- 04 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH BLAKELY-LAVAPIE | Chair | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Juayong | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ERICKSON JAY LAVAPIE | Trustee | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vilma Obina | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLENA AQUINO | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.31k | £43.73k | £84.03k | £96.72k | £142.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.58k | £33.32k | £64.24k | £102.00k | £123.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECTIVE OF HOUSE OF WORSHIP CHRISTIAN CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PRONOUNCEMENT OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN BELIEF AND DOCTRINES. TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT LONDON, THE WHOLE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP, HOLDING DEVOTIONAL PRAYER MEETINGS, CONDUCTING/BROADCASTING LECTURES AND TRAININGS BASED ON CHRISTIAN BELIEFS, PRODUCING AND OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY, CARRYING OUT MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK THROUGHOUT UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Pauls Place
MacBeth Street
London
W6 9JJ
- Phone:
- 07751400921
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window