Financial history THE ZAMBEZI SUNRISE TRUST

Charity number: 1169587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/05/2020 08/05/2021 08/05/2022 08/05/2023 08/05/2024
Total gross income £63.16k £29.84k £37.82k £49.93k £54.80k
Total expenditure £33.55k £178 £35.87k £64.97k £75.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A