THE ZAMBEZI SUNRISE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports children and education in and near Livingstone, Zambia, as well as the relief of poverty and distress. The focus is presently on the construction of school facilities for a school for vulnerable children. Other schools are also supported with the provision of books, computers etc. We have also helped two women's empowerment groups as well as homework club and pre school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Zambia
Governance
- 10 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CHARLES GILLETTE | Chair | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Charles Ashley - Norman Q.C. | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Smith | Trustee | 07 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA SHORT | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE HELEN GILLETTE | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/05/2020 | 08/05/2021 | 08/05/2022 | 08/05/2023 | 08/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.16k | £29.84k | £37.82k | £49.93k | £54.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.55k | £178 | £35.87k | £64.97k | £75.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 May 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 08 May 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 08 May 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 08 May 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 08 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE REPUBLIC OF ZAMBIA, (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST CHILDREN IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS, TEACHING MATERIALS, COOKING MATERIALS, FOODSTUFFS, CLEANING MATERIALS, CLOTHING, SPORTING EQUIPMENT, BUILDING MATERIALS OR MEDICAL SUPPLIES OR THE MAKING OF GRANTS FOR THE PURCHASE OF THE SAME, THE PURCHASE OF LAND UPON WHICH TO BUILD SCHOOL FACILITIES, THE PAYING OF SCHOOL FEES OR THE PAYING OF TEACHER SALARIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KELLOE HALL SOUTH
TOWN KELLOE
KELLOE
DURHAM
DH6 4PR
- Phone:
- 01913772304
- Email:
- johncgillette@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window