SILKROAD SURGERY FOR CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of corrective surgical procedure for deformaties in children from underpriviledged families in Myanmar Healthcare education exchamge through clinical collaboration , firmal and informal lectures Introducing strategies to improve patuent experience
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Burma
- Philippines
- Vietnam
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2018 | 30/03/2019 | 30/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74k | £548 | £1.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.28k | £467 | £1.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 43 days late | |
Annual return | 30 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 March 2018 | 29 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2018 | 29 December 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE HEALTH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL TREATMENT TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION RELATING TO HEALTHCARE AND HEALTH RELATED ISSUES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING WORKING WITH THE LOCAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM TO PROVIDE CLINICAL AND EDUCATION SKILL EXCHANGE AND HEALTHCARE EDUCATION EXCHANGE FOR BOTH DOCTORS AND NURSES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window