PCC of Girlington, Heaton and Manningham

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship, prayer, mission and outreach Learning about the Gospel, and developing knowledge and trust in Jesus Pastoral care Care for the less fortunate through running a weekly cafe in a safe environment Engagement with people of other faiths for better understanding each another and building community Care and hospitality through hosting children's activities Maintaining our church building
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £27,550 from 5 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 31 October 2016: Standard registration
- The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Girlington, Heaton and Manningham (Working name)
- PCC OF ST PAUL'S MANNINGHAM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Emma Wilkinson | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Ben Care | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
clare leighton | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Kafayat Oluseyi Adegoke | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Barbara Ann Brown | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher James Woodard Chorlton | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Ann Griffin | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Angela Mitchell | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Burnley | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Neil John McEwan | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Ray Barrett | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Zarine Billam | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alistair John Bavington | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Karen Moyle | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ROSEMARY GRINTER | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||
JOANNA MARY ALLAN | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.87k | £514.26k | £183.89k | £162.78k | £138.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.18k | £396.89k | £194.62k | £229.37k | £240.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.52k | £31.65k | £7.78k | £46.11k | £27.55k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £353.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £24.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £8.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £126.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £384.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £1.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £8.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £11.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957 as amended on 21 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 St. Pauls Road
Manningham
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD8 7LS
- Phone:
- 07434627013
- Email:
- parish@bradfordwest.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window