OUR MINDS MATTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a registered charity focused on promoting mental health in the diverse communities of Luton and Bedford. Our team consists of individuals who have either professional or personal experience in the field of mental health. We provide mental health education to enhance health seeking behaviours. We deliver mental health first aid, workshops and public engagement events in Luton and Bedford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Luton
Governance
- 03 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOLEL MIAH | Chair | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jalal Saad | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Aganoglu | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH IN LUTON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO FACE CHALLENGES WHEN SEEKING SUPPORT DUE TO THEIR ETHNICITY, RELIGIOUS BELIEFS OR LANGUAGE SPOKEN BY:- 1)PROMOTING MENTAL HEALTH AWARENESS; 2)ASSISTING AND SUPPORTING MENTAL HEALTH SUFFERERS THROUGH ADVICE AND REFERRALS; 3)FACILITATING ACCESS TO MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES; AND 4)EDUCATING AND INCREASING UNDERSTANDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND RELEVANT LEGISLATION.
Area of benefit
IN LUTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
327 DUNSTABLE ROAD
LUTON
LU4 8BU
- Phone:
- 07922533739
- Email:
- info@ourmindsmatter.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window