BACK OTH MOSS COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we are a small centre based in the heart of the local of the local community. we offer a wide range of services which include home work and after school club. Mens mental health sessions IT sessions and computer equipment for job searching weekly social group including lunch. Cardiac rehab twice weekly dance groups party hire room hire youth intervention sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rochdale
Governance
- 28 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Chadwick | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Wilson | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Furlong | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Worrall | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.47k | £42.14k | £44.10k | £139.70k | £118.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.28k | £37.19k | £58.83k | £75.24k | £149.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.32k | £15.21k | N/A | £15.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Feb 2017 as amended on 14 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HEYWOOD, LANCASHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO: ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Back O'Th Moss After School Club
Community Centre
52 Peel Lane
HEYWOOD
OL10 4TU
- Phone:
- 01706810844
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window