THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAWLEY ALL SAINTS'

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anglican parish church council providing worship facilities, community outreach and social activities for the parish of Sawley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £368 from 2 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 21 October 2016: Standard registration
- ALL SAINT'S SAWLEY PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Cavill | Chair | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Parrish | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Micklewright | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Porter | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Scales | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH KRISTIN SIMMONS | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cavill | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ellen Moran | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Phipps | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mellors | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Parker | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Johns | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOAN BENNETT SUITER | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LOUISE BASSFORD | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARGARET HASSALL | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MAUREEN CLAYTON | Trustee | 26 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROSS CLAYTON | Trustee | 09 September 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.59k | £91.34k | £118.64k | £100.35k | £91.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.81k | £98.71k | £81.60k | £105.92k | £92.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.15k | £8.95k | £368 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
561 TAMWORTH ROAD
LONG EATON
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 3FB
- Phone:
- 01159460876
- Email:
- sawleyparish@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window