Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAWLEY ALL SAINTS'
Charity number: 1169836

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Cavill | Chair | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Parrish | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Micklewright | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Porter | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Scales | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH KRISTIN SIMMONS | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cavill | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ellen Moran | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Phipps | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mellors | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Parker | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Johns | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOAN BENNETT SUITER | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LOUISE BASSFORD | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARGARET HASSALL | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MAUREEN CLAYTON | Trustee | 26 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROSS CLAYTON | Trustee | 09 September 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.