Trustees THIRSK COMMUNITY LIBRARY
Charity Number: 1169352

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALLY BURTON | Chair | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Philip Vincent Lewen | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bronwen Mary Cohen | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Marwood | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Anne Patricia Naughton | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY WARD | Trustee | 25 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.