SIGHT CYMRU

Charity Number: 1171471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Services to mitigate the impacts of sensory loss to people in Wales, including Eye Clinic support and Rehabilitation for the Vision Impaired, counselling, emotional support, befriending, activities, telephone helpline, social activities, training and a comprehensive resource centre offering advice, information and advocacy. The charity also encourages preventative strategies to avoid blindness

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • GOLWG CYMRU (Working name)
  • GWENT ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
  • SIGHT SUPPORT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RHODA WILLIAMS Chair 03 July 2018
None on record
Aji Ramanujam Raghuram Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Himalee Rupesinghe Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Prof Rachel North Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Susan Margaret Hughes Trustee 30 May 2022
None on record
Matthew Thomas Trustee 30 May 2022
None on record
Philip Stephen Evans Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Jonathan Mudd Trustee 01 April 2021
THE ABERGAVENNY BOROUGH BAND
Received: On time
John Richard James Beavan Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
DAVID JOHN PHILLIPS Trustee 03 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £440.07k £518.07k £449.91k £554.88k £549.34k
Total expenditure £453.67k £462.57k £470.32k £534.13k £533.25k
Income from government contracts £278.83k £342.63k N/A £411.04k £388.65k
Income from government grants N/A £39.28k £357.38k £0 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £9.97k N/A £16.64k £12.87k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £2.87k N/A £6.85k £17.33k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £481.68k N/A £504.92k £486.77k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £23.55k N/A £26.48k £32.37k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £458.35k N/A £522.40k £524.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £4.22k N/A £11.74k £9.19k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £15.62k N/A £4.75k £4.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £3.11k N/A £3.36k £3.28k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A £443.74k N/A £428.93k £427.49k
Long-term investments N/A £668.72k N/A £670.13k £687.94k
Other assets N/A £198.87k N/A £222.98k £244.01k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £40.46k N/A £40.62k £41.24k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 February 2023 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 February 2023 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/10/1976 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/1982 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/2015 as amended on 13 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE IN WALES.
Area of benefit
WALES
Registration history
  • 07 February 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Sight Cymru
Bradbury House
Park Road
PONTYPOOL
NP4 6JH
Phone:
01495763650