THE ROYAL NAVY SUBMARINE MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public and for the purposes of educating the public in the history of the Submarine Service of the Royal Navy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 27 September 2016: Standard registration
- ROYAL NAVY SUBMARINE MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATIONAL MUSEUM OF THE ROYAL NAVY | Trustee | 02 August 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.86k | £16.93k | £555 | £1.29k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.12k | £94.69k | £9.16k | £4.98k | £7.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE PURPOSES OF EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN NAVAL HISTORY AND OTHER MATTERS RELATING TO THE DEFENCE OF THE REALM: (A) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE ONE OR MORE PUBLIC MUSEUMS AND LIBRARIES OF ALL ASPECTS OF SUBMARINE ENDEAVOUR AND ACHIEVEMENT; (B) TO PRESERVE PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE DISPLAY AND UNDERSTANDING OF, AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL COLLECTIONS, PROPERTY, OBJECTS AND ARTEFACTS HAVING RELEVANCE TO THE HISTORY OF THE SUBMARINE SERVICE OF THE ROYAL NAVY FROM TIME TO TIME; (C) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES BY ASSISTING RECRUITMENT AND RETENTION AND FOSTERING THE ESPRIT DE CORPS OF THE MEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE SERVING IN THE SUBMARINE SERVICE OF THE ROYAL NAVY; (D) TO UPHOLD THE TRADITIONS OF THE SUBMARINE SERVICE OF THE ROYAL NAVY TO PERPETUATE AND COMMEMORATE ITS DEEDS; TO HONOUR AND PRESERVE THE MEMORY OF THOSE WHO HAVE PARTICIPATED IN THE SERVICE; AND TO ENCOURAGE PUBLIC RECOGNITION OF THE SACRIFICE MADE BY THOSE MEMBERS OF THE SERVICE WHO DIED WHILE ON ACTIVE SERVICE; AND (E) TO RELIEVE DISTRESS OR NEED AMONGST PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF ALL RANKS OF THE SUBMARINE SERVICE OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND THEIR DEPENDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HM NAVAL BASE (PP66)
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 3NH
- Phone:
- 02392727562
- Email:
- governance@nmrn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window