Financial history CHARLES YOUNG CENTRE

Charity number: 508814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £104.32k £85.47k £142.04k £142.07k £123.44k
Total expenditure £108.00k £58.59k £106.43k £130.31k £121.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £40.00k £24.49k £5.00k £500