CHARLES YOUNG CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INDOOR BOWLS, DARTS, BINGO NIGHTS & SOCIAL DANCES DAILY LUNCHES & KEEP FIT CLASSES AND MUSIC BUFFET NIGHTS, DAY OUTINGS,SHOPPING TRIPS, HALL HIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 26 June 1979: Standard registration
- THE CHARLES YOUNG CENTRE (Working name)
- SOUTH TYNESIDE HANDICAPPED AND ELDERLY WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Farham | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Eltringham | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WALLIS | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CAULEY | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE FORSTER MRS | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELSA LARSEN | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.32k | £85.47k | £142.04k | £142.07k | £123.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.00k | £58.59k | £106.43k | £130.31k | £121.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £40.00k | £24.49k | £5.00k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MAY 1979, AS AMENDED ON 23RD NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF SOUTH TYNESIDE BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, (B) TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITIES AND THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AND WELL-BEING, (C) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW AND ARE CONNECTS WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ORGANISATION
Area of benefit
SOUTH TYNESIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHARLES YOUNG DAY CENTRE
TALBOT ROAD
SOUTH SHIELDS
NE34 0QJ
- Phone:
- 01914543241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window